Financial history THIRD SPACE MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1155538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56.14k £83.96k £64.29k £52.24k £61.73k
Total expenditure £66.20k £76.06k £60.09k £65.36k £73.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A