GLORIOUS REVIVAL CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals, producing and/or distributing literature to enlighten others about the Christian faith. The prevention or relief of poverty by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or organisations working to prevent or r
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 March 2014: Standard registration
- REVIVAL CENTRE MILTON KEYNES LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEWALE ADEBAYO ADEBAYO | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
NGOZICHUKWU DEBORAH R JOSEPH-EDOYIBO Joseph-Edoyibo | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CASTENS | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.01k | £23.01k | £41.25k | £31.39k | £14.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.70k | £35.70k | £24.34k | £27.39k | £52.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2014
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS,LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS]PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.2.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING:GRANTS,ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES,OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.3.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY(OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE)FOR PERSONS,BODIES,ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 DANIELS WELCH
COFFEE HALL
MILTON KEYNES
MK6 5DY
- Phone:
- 07841049032
- Email:
- jk.edoyibo@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window