CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH DERBYSHIRE JAMIA MASJID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing religious advice to Muslims and non-muslims Providing information to communities about islam and tolerance Providing religious activities including 5 times prayers in congregation Teaching Children Quranic classes Providing spiritual guidance teaching people on the benefits of sufism and Tassawuf
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £3,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD RAFIQUE | Chair | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR SAJJID RAZAQ | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
NISAR SULEMAN | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ZUBAIR | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Masood FAROOQ | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED RAZAQ | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.67k | £35.51k | £35.83k | £37.20k | £33.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.87k | £4.95k | £32.66k | £29.18k | £36.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2022 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2022 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2022 | 561 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2022 | 561 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN CHESTERFIELD,NORTH DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS,LECTURES,PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS,PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chesterfield Muslim Association
29 Newbold Road
Chesterfield
S41 7PG
- Phone:
- 07405886946
- Email:
- mrrazaqcjm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window