CHADWELL HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Community Centre serving the residents of Chadwell Heath with a range of activities and programmes including a Community Library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £33,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 03 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Perry | Chair | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bailey Taylor | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Susan Paddle | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bibi Zeiboon Nessa Heerah | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Taylor Victoria Helen | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KHALID AHMED SADI | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAL UDDIN | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.89k | £34.16k | £35.08k | £31.13k | £86.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.93k | £53.12k | £31.80k | £58.70k | £81.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.37k | £10.00k | £1.38k | N/A | £33.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CHADWELL HEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ASSIST IN THE RUNNING OF THE CHADWELL HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN, DEVELOP OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
255
Chadwell Heath Library
High Road
ROMFORD
RM6 6AS
- Phone:
- 02082704305
- Email:
- chadwellheathcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window