DEVON & CORNWALL 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect human life and property by supplementing and supporting emergency services, statutory bodies and other organisations as deemed appropriate by the trustees, in particular but not exclusively by providing 4x4 vehicles and drivers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 29 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Robert Emery | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jade Palmer | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Clarke | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Seaward | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Hole | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bernard Welch | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Joseph Gowing | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44k | £12.88k | £13.43k | £28.04k | £39.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £13.14k | £11.47k | £25.84k | £35.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Oct 2013 as amended on 20 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY BY SUPPLEMENTING AND SUPPORTING EMERGENCY SERVICES, STATUTORY BODIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING 4X4 VEHICLES AND DRIVERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devon and Cornwall 4x4 Response
Mor Workspace
Treloggan Lane
NEWQUAY
Cornwall
TR7 2FP
- Phone:
- 01752922905
- Email:
- secretary@dc4x4r.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window