THE GILDA STREET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST COLLECTS AND DISBURSES DONATIONS IN LINE WITH THE TRUST'S CHARITABLE AIMS WHICH ARE TO ASSIST, PROMOTE AND SUPPORT ORAL HISTORY PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN O'NEILL | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LORRAINE GAMMAN | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.16k | £3.31k | £5.60k | £11.24k | £7.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.77k | £4.43k | £12.81k | £19.24k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH IN THE SOCIAL HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE EAST END OF LONDON AND ITS ENVIRONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.1.1 THE COLLECTION, PRESERVATION AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC, MATERIAL OF HISTORIC SIGNIFICANCE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ORAL HISTORIES, PHOTOGRAPHIC AND OTHER DOCUMENTS AND ARTEFACTS WHICH, INTER ALIA, TELL THE STORY OF WORKING CLASS PEOPLE; 2.1.2 INCREASING THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF DR GILDA ANN O'NEILL (1951 - 2010) INCLUDING PRESERVATION OF THE ARCHIVE OF HER PAPERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 603
Titanium Point
24 Palmers Road
Bethnal Green
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07733323034
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window