Trustees THE LONGHORN CATTLE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1159780

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Christopher Roads | Chair | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Stanley | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elise Sutton | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Mills | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Phillips | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Walker | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thea Jacqueline Woollatt | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bertrand Facon | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Mathias Llewellyn MBE | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.