Financial history BOGNOR REGIS U3A

Charity number: 1154102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.64k £4.33k £31.13k £31.31k £23.32k
Total expenditure £45.87k £9.90k £31.83k £33.59k £25.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A