THANET CAP DEBT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty for persons in Thanet (South East Kent) who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by reason of their social and or economic circumstances by providing a free debt counselling service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £120 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS IN THANET (SOUTH EAST KENT) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING A FREE DEBT COUNSELING SERVICE;AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 16 WHO ARE AT SCHOOL IN MONEY MANAGEMENT / BUDGETING AND PRACTICAL MONEY SKILLS.
Area of benefit
THANET (SOUTH EAST KENT)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window