RAY (REFUGEE ACTION YORK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Running a weekly Sunday drop-in for asylum seeker, refugee and migrant families at Clifton Children's Centre. -English Language classes - Outreach with and for the asylum, refugee and migrant community in the City of York. - Campaigning on behalf of local asylum seeking individuals and families. - Organising the annual Refugee Week in York. - Events during and outside Refugee Week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,745 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 02 October 2013: CIO registration
- 17 September 2014: Funds received from 1130980 REFUGEE ACTION YORK
- RAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Hugh Croft | Chair | 23 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Hussni Nakeshbandi | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iryna Martynyuk-Lototska | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valentin Muhire | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Creswick | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachel Bateson | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary McCormack | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annette Maas | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marwa Dorai | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.39k | £198.83k | £173.44k | £331.75k | £277.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.13k | £126.69k | £130.38k | £232.23k | £331.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.30k | £150 | £19.54k | £41.36k | £50.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Oct 2013 as amended on 07 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST MIGRANTS, THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Clifton Children's Centre
Kingsway North
York
YO30 6JA
- Phone:
- 07545060694
- Email:
- info@refugeeactionyork.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window