YORK FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty, hardship or distress through the provision of food to people in need of emergency supplies in York and the surrounding area and by such other means as the trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CALEB SAMUEL ELLWOOD | Chair | 07 October 2013 |
|
|||||
David Keith Brown | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Fuller | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
James David Topliss | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA DAWNE MOORE | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.32k | £384.91k | £212.14k | £375.48k | £317.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.14k | £72.19k | £217.52k | £272.14k | £354.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD TO PEOPLE IN NEED OF EMERGENCY SUPPLIES IN YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Foodbank
5 Sterling Park
Bleriot Way
YORK
YO30 4WU
- Phone:
- 07871610894
- Email:
- info@york.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window