HOME-START SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Surrey, through the 8 local schemes across the county, delivers free, confidential and non-judgemental support to families with a child under five years of age. Under the umbrella of Home-Start Surrey, trained volunteers support families with a tailor made service in their own home, with Home-Start Surrey providing joint approaches and good practice to support these quality services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £280,892 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 December 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Ann Limond | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Judith McGuire | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Desmond Parker | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Tann | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Clark | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN CLARE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
BRIONY THOMAS | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.00k | £282.70k | £282.70k | £323.08k | £307.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.72k | £284.65k | £282.68k | £319.70k | £309.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £325.00k | £282.70k | £282.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £313.05k | £280.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF HOME-START CHARITIES IN SURREY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) HELPING WITH THE EFFECTIVE ATTAINMENT OF RECIPIENT CHARITIES' OBJECTS; AND (B) SUPPORTING THE ADMINISTRATION AND INFRASTRUCTURE OF THE CHARITIES IN PARTICULAR BY CO-ORDINATING FUNDING BIDS AND GRANT APPLICATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME-START SURREY
VERNON HOUSE
28 WEST STREET
FARNHAM
GU9 7DR
- Phone:
- 01252737453
- Email:
- chair@homestartsurrey.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window