Trustees MATHEMATICS RECOVERY COUNCIL UK AND IRELAND
Charity number: 1158077

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE LOUISE MADINE BA NPQH | Chair | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rendle PGCE, MSc | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Maw B.ED | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Stewart BSc,PGDE | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Alexandra Craik | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Roy William Grice | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PORTER | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUTH ELIZABETH WILLEY MED DEDPSY | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JANE STAUNTON-UNSWORTH BED | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.