UK Giving

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Subsidised studio/desk space for local artists Micro finance start up lending Empowering local youth with creative arts and music workshops from industry profressionals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- India
Governance
- 27 November 2013: CIO registration
- Blighty Giving (Previous name)
- FINSBURY PARK ARTS (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Surinder Duhra | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS EVANS | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.87k | £9.10k | £720 | £400 | £240 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.00k | £25.45k | £4.86k | £4.65k | £987 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
09 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Nov 2013 as amended on 23 Jul 2021 as amended on 05 May 2022 as amended on 09 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY ASSISTING UNESTABLISHED ARTISTS LIVING IN HARINGEY, HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, TO BECOME SELF-SUPPORTING THROUGH ART. (2) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE IN FINANCIAL AND ECONOMIC NEED LIVING IN HARINGEY, HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, WORKSPACE AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO BECOME SELF SUPPORTING. (3) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (4) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HARINGEY, HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
266-268 High Road
Tottenham
LONDON
N15 4AJ
- Phone:
- 07974979340
- Email:
- giving@blightygroup.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window