Financial history HARRABY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £211.00k £130.50k £235.84k £319.68k £341.90k
Total expenditure £144.00k £133.61k £205.45k £307.72k £345.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.78k £54.78k £53.50k £61.35k £43.71k