HARRABY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
wide range of Social, educational, activities available to the people of Carlisle & the wider areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,713 from 7 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 March 2014: CIO registration
- HARRABY COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Gerard Rogerson | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Lamonby | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
lynda Campbell | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Scroggie | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SMITH | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
OLI SLACK | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
anne dalton | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
jo ellis-williams | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Liz Jackson | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.00k | £130.50k | £235.84k | £319.68k | £341.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.00k | £133.61k | £205.45k | £307.72k | £345.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.78k | £54.78k | £53.50k | £61.35k | £43.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF CARLISLE AND IN PARTICULAR THAT AREA KNOWN AS HARRABY DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OF OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CIO), AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF ACTIVITIES BY THE CIO, AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES. 3. TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harraby Community Centre
Harraby Community Campus
Edgehill Road
CARLISLE
CA1 3SN
- Phone:
- 01228537831
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window