Accounts and annual returns THE SIERRA LEONE ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION (SLIA) READING

Charity number: 1155105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 February 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required