THE CRANIOSACRAL THERAPY ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Craniosacral Therapy Association supports health and well-being through the practice of craniosacral therapy. It produces leading edge research to develop the therapy and inform the public. The association regulates Craniosacral Therapists in a balanced, just manner - maintaining professional standards of training and practice to protect the therapy and its users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 March 2014: CIO registration
- CSTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatrice Doubble | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mather | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA DOBEY | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aine Juliette Ashby | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lizette Villaverde | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Goodes | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Koval-Radley | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.57k | £69.00k | £58.42k | £62.21k | £77.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.96k | £70.00k | £66.79k | £69.22k | £72.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH THROUGH THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CRANIOSACRAL THERAPY AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ORGANISATION FOR PERSONS ENGAGED IN THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CRANIOSACRAL THERAPY; 2) TO ENSURE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY PRESCRIBING THE STANDARDS OF COMPETENCE AND SUITABILITY FOR THE ELECTION OF APPLICANTS TO MEMBERSHIP, AND BY REGULATING TRAINING ORGANISATIONS ACCREDITED BY CSTA, IN ORDER TO MAINTAIN STANDARDS OF TRAINING AND SUPERVISION AND TO ESTABLISH AND UPHOLD A CODE OF ETHICS FOR ENTRY INTO THE PROFESSION; 3) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHILOSOPHY AND PRACTICE OF CRANIOSACRAL THERAPY AND TO ACT AS A STIMULUS FOR PERSONS UNDERTAKING RESEARCH CONCERNING CRANIOSACRAL THERAPY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monomark House
27 Old Gloucester Street
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 07977263042
- Email:
- admin@craniosacral.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window