NAILSEA TITHE BARN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nailsea Tithe Barn Trust exists to foster a strong sense of community around the magnificently restored medieval Tithe Barn. The Trust organises cultural, social and recreational events for all members of the Nailsea community including working with local schools to widen the awareness of the Barn's history by offering teaching and learning opportunities at the Barn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,160 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 21 November 2013: CIO registration
- 09 January 2015: Funds received from 1112062 THE NAILSEA TITHE BARN TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Jo Edwards | Chair | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Laver | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Thomas | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pelmear | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA IRENE CALVERT | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANCIS | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SANDY RILEY | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.28k | £7.56k | £15.67k | £20.21k | £22.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.88k | £10.14k | £12.01k | £15.57k | £20.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £850 | £1.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF NAILSEA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,AGE,DISABILITY,NATIONALITY,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.2.THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH,AGE,ILL-HEALTH AND DISABILITY.3.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ASSISTING IN THE PRESERVATION OF NAILSEA TITHE BARN
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 GREENSLADE GARDENS
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 2BL
- Phone:
- 01275790399
- Email:
- barbaracalvert47@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window