ETERNAL LIFE CHRISTIAN CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities aimed at fulfilling the objects of the organisation include weekly Sunday services and Saturday Bible Study/Evangelism. The church organises a number of special services at Christmas, and on Mothers & Fathers day. ELCC also provides pastoral care for disadvantaged people, the elderly, single mums and divorced/separated couples and helping them get back on their feet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
Governance
- 18 November 2013: CIO registration
- ELCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicia Oramalu | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chukwudi Molokwu Molokwu | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR OSCAR OSCAR | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.12k | £16.38k | £18.20k | £25.63k | £38.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.23k | £17.14k | £18.05k | £19.06k | £22.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH RELIEVING THE SICK IN THE SOCIETY AND HELPING THE NEEDY
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 Mount Pleasant Avenue
St. Helens
WA9 2PT
- Phone:
- 07747084849
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window