Trustees GLOW CHURCH UK

Charity number: 1154239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Warren Gordon Eriksson Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
Ian Peter Edward Duffew Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Amy Sarah Glassbrook Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
Andrew George Cherrie Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Felix Clack Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Steven William Mawston Trustee 02 March 2021
None on record