CHARITY OF JOHN BYRNE FOR POOR BOYS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Lancashire
Governance
- 17 April 1975: Standard registration
- 01 March 2005: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL P.P.R. ON 14 FEBRUARY 1919 AND SCHEME OF 21 FEBRUARY 1975.
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND EDUCATION OF POOR BOYS RESIDENT IN ANY CHILDREN'S OR COMMUNITY HOME SITUATE WITHIN A RADIUS OF 20 MILES FROM PRESTON TOWN HALL IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE.
Area of benefit
20 MILE RADIUS FROM PRESTON TOWN HALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window