NEWCASTLE FENCING & SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a facility to be used to train fencers, modern pentathletes and air pistol target shooters of all abilities and backgrounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RAYMOND DICKSON | Chair | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lovell Row | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD COUNTER | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.49k | £91.41k | £52.39k | £25.85k | £61.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.25k | £81.92k | £62.21k | £42.35k | £61.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.43k | £28.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/11/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS:1.1TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN FENCING AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING FITNESS AND HEALTH(FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND,BUILDINGS,EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES);1.2TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT,RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;1.3TO RELIEVE ILLNESS AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH BY:1.3.1 PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN FENCING AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING FITNESS AND HEALTH;1.3.2ADVANCING EDUCATION(INCLUDING PHYSICAL,ACADEMIC AND SOCIAL EDUCATION)IN DIET,NUTRITION AND HEALTHY EATING;AND1.3.3SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY;1.4TO ADVANCE EDUCATION(INCLUDING PHYSICAL,ACADEMIC AND SOCIAL EDUCATION)BY:1.4.1PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES IN DIET,NUTRITION AND HEALTHY EATING;1.4.2PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND COACHING AT ALL LEVELS;1.4.3MAKING GRANTS,LOANS AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE;AND1.4.4 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fencing Centre
Unit B3
Benfield Business Park
Benfield Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 4NQ
- Phone:
- 07960363485
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window