Ozero Arts

Charity number: 1155338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ozero Arts partners with cultural organisations and artists to conceive, produce and raise funds for bold ideas. The charity works across the arts but has a particular focus on classical music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £274,772
Total expenditure: £278,241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MELOS SINFONIA (Previous name)
  • THE MELOS SINFONIA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Charles Christopher Sleigh Trustee 03 September 2024
NORWICH THEATRE ENDOWMENT FUND CIO
Recently registered
Freya Waley-Cohen Trustee 04 December 2023
FRANCIS ROUTH TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID ZEFFMAN Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record
Oliver Zeffman Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record
EDWARD SMITH Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £81.66k £22.50k £50.25k £54.93k £274.77k
Total expenditure £76.54k £7.93k £69.95k £53.07k £278.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o CMS LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London
EC4N 6AF
Phone:
02070673000