DOWN SYNDROME DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enrichment activities for children and young people with Down syndrome such as sports music, training for parents and school staff based around the specific learning profile of children with Down syndrome. Consultations for parents and into schools. reading interventions and resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £10,850 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 February 2014: Standard registration
- DSDT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Passey | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SMALLWOOD | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA PIKE | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEN SMALLWOOD | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.51k | £88.77k | £103.50k | £138.03k | £178.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.82k | £74.04k | £94.80k | £127.61k | £200.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £10.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECT (“THE OBJECTS”) IS THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH AND INTERVENTION TO IMPROVE AND ENHANCE THE LIVES OF PEOPLE BORN WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Saltwood Road
Seaford
BN25 3SP
- Phone:
- 01323 893323
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window