Financial history OAKEY DOKEYS PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1156087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £92.00k £90.35k £115.53k £116.40k £119.33k
Total expenditure £99.41k £97.02k £117.25k £112.94k £137.24k
Income from government contracts £79.36k N/A £101.28k £92.49k £94.27k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.50k N/A £1.50k