FLECKNEY BAPTIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school is in purpose-built premises & is accessible to all children. It operates from 3 playrooms & has an enclosed area for outdoor play. It employs 7 staff & opens Monday to Friday during term time: 9am - 3pm. It provides funded early education for 2,3 & 4 year old children. It supports children who speak English as a second language & any with special educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Lillicrapp | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joseph Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edith Townsend | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Kim-Louise Deacon | Trustee | 03 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Maggs | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.75k | £85.39k | £93.88k | £110.70k | £102.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.19k | £87.36k | £100.91k | £109.94k | £123.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, CHILDREN RESIDING IN FLECKNEY, LEICESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
FLECKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLECKNEY BAPTIST CHURCH
HIGH STREET
FLECKNEY
LEICESTER
LE8 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01162404276
- Email:
- fbcps1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window