CLAYTON HALL LIVING HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to enhance the visitor and education offers to include activities in both the Victorian and Tudor sections, including public open days twice a month plus seasonal family/community events. School/groups visits by arrangement. Monthly Afternoon Teas from April to August. History talks about the Hall for other organisations as requested. General cleaning/maintenance of the Hall and grounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 17 January 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Robert Mason | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie J Bayliss-Brideaux | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jim Battle | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|||||
PAULINE OWEN | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNN BLINKHORN | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAY DORENE SYMCOX | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.93k | £2.95k | £4.37k | £3.88k | £26.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £3.39k | £12.25k | £6.52k | £10.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT CLAYTON HALL IN EAST MANCHESTER TOGETHER WITH ITS MOATED SURROUNDS AS A HERITAGE CENTRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
EAST MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 STANTON STREET
MANCHESTER
M11 4PX
- Phone:
- 01612316366
- Email:
- info@claytonhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window