ONE YOUTH DANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with young people aged 11 - 19 and aim to reach those on the edge of society through dance. We provide weekly dance sessions, mentoring, emotional support, and performance opportunities throughout the year. In our short history we've worked with almost 500 young people and seen every dancer who has wished to progress onto further education within the performing arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.33k | £37.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.51k | £41.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 08 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 11 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 11 May 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 10/12/2013 AMENDED ON 06/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS,ESPECIALLY THE PERFORMING ARTS,AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window