Accounts and annual returns FAMILY AID

Charity Number: 1154705
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 04 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 04 September 2015 On Time