SIGHT SUPPORT OLDHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society has been established to promote the welfare of those people of all ages living within the Metropolitan Borough of Oldham and surrounding areas, who are registered with the local authority as being: severely sight impaired/blind, sight impaired/partially sighted, or have a registerable eye condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oldham
Governance
- 14 April 1975: Standard registration
- 06 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 January 2016: Funds transferred to 221888 HENSHAWS SOCIETY FOR BLIND PEOPLE
- OLDHAM BLIND SOCIETY (Working name)
- OLDHAM METROPOLITAN SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- OLDHAM SOCIETY FOR BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.73k | £21.02k | £13.47k | £12.98k | £12.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.99k | £46.29k | £45.40k | £41.65k | £23.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 26 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE SOCIETY ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1975 AS AMENDED 7 OCTOBER 1997 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2012 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S PRINCIPLE OBJECT IS: TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THOSE PEOPLE OF ALL AGES LIVING WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BROUGH OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE REGISTERED WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AS BEING: SEVERELY SIGHT IMPAIRED / BLIND SIGHT IMPAIRED / PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR HAVE A REGISTERABLE EYE CONDITION.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF OLDHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window