BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM AND ASCOT BANGLADESHI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity work for the Bangladeshi community.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 06 December 2013: Standard registration
- BWA BANGLADESHI WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL ROUF | Chair | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED SHAMSUL ARIPIN | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|||||
SHAHEDUL HAQUE CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR MUZIBUR RAHMAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDUN NOOR | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF ALL RESIDENTS OF BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM AND ASCOT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM AND ASCOT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS. 3. TO PROVIDE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM AND ASCOT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGIOUS BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI AND MUSLIM COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO THE SOCIETY BY: A. PROVIDING LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI AND MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. B. INCREASING OR CO-OPERATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI AND MUSLIM COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADOPT SERVICES TO BETTER THE NEEDS OF THESE COMMUNITIES. 4. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL NEEDS AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KIND OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS AS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Wilberforce Way
Bracknell
RG12 9PN
- Phone:
- 01344862357
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window