KELTEK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To promote the re-use of surplus or redundant church bells. 2) Giving of grants for the provision of bells or bell restoration. 3) To promote research into the sound of church bells and the methods emploed in retuning. 4) The provision of funding of ringing centres for the training of bell-ringers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- Malta
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- South Africa
Governance
- 04 October 2013: CIO registration
- 03 April 2014: Funds received from 1061224 KELTEK TRUST
- KELTEK TRUST (MIGRATION TO CIO) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PRESTON | Chair | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN KELLY | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY KELLY | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.52k | £25.32k | £18.88k | £24.23k | £48.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.97k | £41.29k | £61.47k | £65.90k | £61.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORKS OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHURCH BELLS AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF CHURCH BELL RINGING AND IN PARTICULAR: (1) TO PROMOTE THE RE-USE OF SURPLUS OR REDUNDANT BELLS. (2) THE GIVING OF GRANTS FOR THE PROVISION OF BELLS OR BELL RESTORATION. (3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE SOUND OF BELLS AND THE METHODS EMPLOYED IN TUNING. (4) THE PROVISION OF FUNDING OF RINGING CENTRES FOR THE TRAINING OF BELLRINGERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Kloof
Lower Kingsdown Road
Kingsdown
Corsham
SN13 8BG
- Phone:
- 01225742325
- Email:
- bells@keltektrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window