STREETLIGHT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
StreetLight is an indoor Skate park and cafe. We run activities and events on the park, like Girl skate nights, who let the dads out, kids parties. and many more events. We also run in the cafe, film and discussion evenings. skater bible study. and lots of one off events. Through everything we do we aim to reach those who have not herd of Jesus and introduce them to him .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,142 from 2142 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 March 2014: CIO registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 1137221 LEIGH PARK (WIMBORNE MINSTER) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIO...
- STREETLIGHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Edward Curry | Chair | 04 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Debbie Tudor-Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Steger-Lewis | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hobson | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILGRESS | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE WILGRESS | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.50k | £169.44k | £159.97k | £168.33k | £162.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.69k | £84.15k | £174.26k | £171.42k | £177.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.64k | £23.48k | £4.45k | £2.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN DORSET AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
StreetLight Project
STONE LANE INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
STONE LANE
WIMBORNE
BH21 1HB
- Phone:
- 01202007762
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window