Financial history RAINBOW PARENTS CARERS FORUM

Charity Number: 1155205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.10k £190.62k £131.95k £118.18k £124.33k
Total expenditure £141.36k £122.60k £126.68k £97.85k £132.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.95k
Income from government grants £31.01k N/A N/A £21.20k £20.95k