HINCKLEY CHORAL UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Three or more performance concerts per annum. Weekly rehearsals in preparation. Three free singing workshops per annum held to promote health and social benefits of singing in a group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 07 October 2013: Standard registration
- HCU (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Alistair Herd | Chair | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Scola | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Farquharson | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Piers Hainsworth | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.47k | £490 | £5.17k | £9.13k | £14.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.07k | £468 | £4.72k | £9.21k | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1) TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON CHORAL SINGING, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Station Road
Market Bosworth
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV13 0LT
- Phone:
- 01455 290767
- Email:
- hcuchoir@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window