NORTH NOTTS CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the performance of music, providing members with the opportunity to develop vocal technique and musical repertoire through regular rehearsal with professional conductor and accompanist. The charity presents to audiences high quality performances of sacred choral music, often working with younger people offering them the opportunity to work with professional musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
Governance
- 20 December 2013: Standard registration
- NNCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Hanford | Chair | 09 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Faith Dooley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Fox | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SLACK | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.83k | £5.59k | £0 | £3.00k | £6.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £2.46k | £348 | £5.23k | £6.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, IN PARTICULAR BY A) ESTABLISHING A CHOIR THAT SERVES, AND DRAWS ITS MEMBERS FROM, THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; B) PROVIDING THE PUPILS OF WORKSOP COLLEGE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY OF SINGING MAJOR CHORAL WORKS WITH ADULT VOICES; C) THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, RECITALS AND HOLDING OF CHORAL DAYS AND WORKSHOPS; D) THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Scholey Avenue
Woodsetts
WORKSOP
S81 8SF
- Phone:
- 01909568498
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window