EARL SHILTON SENIOR CITIZENS' CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 06 May 1975: Standard registration
- 29 January 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LESE DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS VARIED BY A DEED OF THE 17 MARCH 1975 AND SCHEME OF 14 MAY 1986
Charitable objects
THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PROPERTY FOR PURPOSES OF RECREATION TO SUCH OF THE RESIDENTS OF EARL SHILTON AS SHALL BE MEMBERS OF THE EARL SHILTON '65' CLUB OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE CLUB WHICH MAY WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE LESSEES BE ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROVISION OF RECREATION ON THE PROPERTY DEMISED FOR ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN EARL SHILTON AND TH EXPRESSION "THE EARL SHILTON '65' CLUB" SHALL BE DEEMED TO MEAN AND INCLUDE ANY OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE CLUB.
Area of benefit
EARL SHILTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.