BOSTON KUK SOOL WON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the accommodation for the training in martial arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 November 2013: Standard registration
- BOSTON KSW CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J BOYALL | Chair | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Johnson | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS M MEGGAT | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £527 | £13 | £1.33k | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.88k | £0 | £528 | £650 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 AUG 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BOSTON, LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING IN TRADITIONAL KOREAN MARTIAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
BOSTON, LINCOLNSHIRE AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Knight Street
Pinchbeck
Spalding
PE11 3RB
- Phone:
- 07710444662
- Email:
- bostonkswcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window