EDUCATION UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improvement and development of primary education for the benefit of children of primary school age, their families and the wider community in Uganda Relief of financial hardship and unemployment by assisting in the provision of education, training, workshops and other such services as the trustees deem appropriate so as to improve the life of persons living in Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 October 2013: CIO registration
- 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1121842 EDUCATION UGANDA
- SOUTH RWENZORI LINKS (Working name)
- EDUCATIONUGANDA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER RONALD LLOYD | Chair | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pomfret Kirby | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Rennie | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn James | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | £15.04k | £5.56k | £63.70k | £11.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.74k | £21.62k | £12.92k | £45.12k | £67.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
A)THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF PRIMARY EDUCATION,INCLUDING TEACHER TRAINING,FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN OF PRIMARY SCHOOL AGE,THEIR FAMILIES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN AFRICA AND,IN PARTICULAR,UGANDA(WHICH SHALL BE THE CHARITY'S AREA OF BENEFIT)B)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND UNEMPLOYMENT BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION,TRAINING,WORKSHOPS AND OTHER SUCH SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS LIVING IN UGANDA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hambledon
Romsey Road
Broughton
STOCKBRIDGE
Hampshire
SO20 8DB
- Phone:
- 01794301821
- Email:
- chriseduganda@outlook.org
- Website:
-
educationuganda.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window