WHITLEY AMATEUR BOXING & FITNESS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run boxing training/fitness sessions for young people in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 08 November 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Muston | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Earl Stewart | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dan Muston | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mason | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.79k | £31.74k | £37.68k | £26.34k | £26.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.25k | £30.11k | £31.08k | £35.10k | £27.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £24.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHITLEY, READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIM MASON
Flat 5
18 St. Peters Hill
Caversham
READING
RG4 7AX
- Phone:
- 01189463443
- Email:
- tim@masonsestateagents.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window