TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA (TN) FACIAL PAIN (FP) PROMOTION OF AN IMPROVED QUALITY OF LIFE IN RESPECT OF TN & FP A) PROVIDING EVIDENCE-BASED INFORMATION, SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT & ADDING TO THE BODY OF KNOWLEDGE & RESEARCH B) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION & ADVICE TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM TN & FP C) RAISING AWARENESS OF TN & FP SYMPTOMS TREATMENT & RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 December 2013: CIO registration
- 20 January 2015: Funds received from 1093022 TRIGEMINAL NEURALGIA ASSOCIATION UK
- TNA UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Lucchetti | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JACKSON JP | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
tony Williams | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Edwards | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Cooper | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.58k | £59.55k | £116.77k | £108.39k | £189.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.55k | £89.28k | £123.25k | £158.46k | £148.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 13 DEC 2013 AMENDED ON 17 AUG 2017 as amended 20 November 2021 as amended on 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
The relief of those suffering from Trigeminal Neuralgia ? Face Pain and the promotion of an improved quality of life in respect of this condition, in particular by: a) providing evidence-based information, support and encouragement and adding to the body of knowledge about Trigeminal Neuralgia ? Face Pain; b) the provision of support, information and advice (other than medical advice) to people suffering from Trigeminal Neuralgia - Face Pain c) raising awareness of Trigeminal Neuralgia ? Face Pain, its symptoms and management; and d) to support research projects deemed beneficial to?Trigeminal Neuralgia ? Face Pain sufferers (including campaigning for research funds),??acknowledging that it will be at the discretion of the Trustees as to whether further support for a particular project is of such importance that it warrants raising additional funds for research.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELLESDON MANOR HOUSE
28 HELLESDON MILL LANE
NORWICH
NR6 5AY
- Phone:
- 08009991899
- Email:
- ANEETA.PREM@TNA.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window