HASLEMERE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity commenced trading on 1st January 2016 after taking over the running of the Haslemere Hall for the benefit of the people of Haslemere and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Paul McMillan Dear | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Lucy Rosina Moir | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
William John Reid Gardner | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lorraine Anne Collins | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lian Barrow | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Adrian Peter Stent | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PAUL MICHAEL THOMPSON | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
STEPHEN JAMES BENNETT | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
NICHOLAS WESTCOTT-WHITE | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Kim Seymour | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
GUY DAVENPORT | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
HAMISH DONALDSON MBE DL | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JENNIFER HILL | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £440.01k | £190.80k | £252.63k | £266.27k | £269.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £451.06k | £239.80k | £218.05k | £282.40k | £286.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HASLEMERE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HASLEMERE HALL
BRIDGE ROAD
HASLEMERE
GU27 2AS
- Phone:
- 01428 661793
- Email:
- boxoffice@haslemerehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window