GIVE ME A HUG
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give Me A Hug works for underprivileged and vulnerable young people to develop their skills and abilities through vocational training and workshops. It also works for victims of natural disaster or catastrophe anywhere in the world providing food and shelter. We also work for general charitable purposes, prevention or relief of poverty, arts / culture / heritage / science and animals protection.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 30 January 2014: Standard registration
- 13 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GIVE ME A HUG (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/01/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING COURSES. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN TOWER HAMLETS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION; B) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. AND 3) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER AND SHELTER.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS BANGLADESH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.