AL-FATH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place of worship for our community To provide realistic opportunities for members of the community Promote cohesion between communities of different Faith Raise awareness about hate crimes, citizenship, community cohesion and social participation Organise social events, sports and leisure activities for families and young people Provide advice and guidance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 May 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Havering
- Islington
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 30 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YACINE CHIHEB | Chair | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/05/2020 | 21/05/2021 | 21/05/2022 | 21/05/2023 | 21/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.44k | £395.67k | £412.18k | £324.48k | £325.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.76k | £179.97k | £121.87k | £124.92k | £166.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days | |
Annual return | 21 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2021 | 23 May 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2021 | 23 May 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 May 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/08/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY: 4.1.1 BETTERING THE WELLBEING OF THE PUBLIC BY ADDRESSING KEY ISSUES SUCH AS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF THE POVERTY, WHEREBY THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE A WIDE RANGE OF SERVICES, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES THAT AIMS TO IMPROVE AND RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP OF THE PUBLIC, EITHER FINANCIALLY LIKE PROVISION OF A TWO-COURSE MEAL TWICE A WEEK (MONDAYS & THURSDAYS) FOR THE HOMELESS, SINGLE, PEOPLE WHO ARE PASSERS-BY (TRAVELLING) AND PEOPLE WITH LOW INCOMES; 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY: 4.2.1 PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WHO CANNOT AFFORD TO ENROL AT COLLEGE TO LEARN ARABIC, CV WRITING, ASSISTANCE WITH WRITING LETTERS, ADVOCACY, AND ASSISTANCE WITH FILLING FORMS SUCH AS IMMIGRATIONS, DIVORCE, AND BENEFIT APPEALS WHEREBY THEY CAN BE CHARGED TO ACCESS SUCH TYPE OF SERVICES; AND 4.2.2 PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY AND THE PUBLIC TO LEARN NEW SKILLS AND DEVELOP ABILITIES, SUCH AS PRESENTATION SKILLS, CASE DISCUSSIONS, WORKSHOPS AND ICT LEARNING; 4.3 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY: 4.3.1 ESTABLISHING A CONSISTENT ACTIVITY PROVISION FOR THE YOUTH BY ORGANISING SUPPORT ACTIVITIES SESSIONS, HEALTHY EATING, AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT CRIME PREVENTION AND ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR BY DIRECTING THEM INTO MEANINGFUL ACTIVITIES AND COMMUNITY WORK; 4.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY: 4.4.1 ACTIVELY AIMING AT PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP; 4.4.2 TRYING TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES; 4.4.3 HELPING MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS; 4.4.4 CONTINUING TO HELP, SUPPORT AND BETTER THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ACCESS ITS RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES SUCH AS THE FRIDAY PRAYERS, SATURDAY AND SUNDAY RELIGIOUS GATHERINGS TO IMPROVE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC PERCEPTION OF RELIGION AS A FRAMEWORK AND SET OF BELIEFS THAT CAN HELP AND ENHANCE SOCIAL COHESION AND HARMONY WITH OTHER RELIGIOUS GROUPS/FAITHS; AND 4.4.5 ACTIVELY SUPPORTING AND EMPOWERING PEOPLE TO PRACTICE RELIGION IN A RATHER SAFER, TOLERANT AND HARMONIOUS MANNER, ESPECIALLY DURING THE HOLY FESTIVALS SUCH AS RAMADAN, HAJ AND EID; 4.5 THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND HEALTHY LIVING BY: 4.5.1 ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO EAT HEALTHILY AND ENGAGE IN SPORT ACTIVITIES; 4.5.2 ADVISING PEOPLE TO HAVE REGULAR HEALTH CHECKS; AND 4.5.3 SHARING INFORMATION ABOUT HEALTH SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 CENTRAL PARADE
HOE STREET
LONDON
E17 4RT
- Phone:
- 07958186307
- Email:
- contact@alfathtrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
ALFATHTRUST.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window