WIGGINTON RECREATION HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO OPERATE AND MANAGE WIGGINTON RECREATION HALL AS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WIGGINTON IN THE CITY OF YORK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,085 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 27 November 2013: CIO registration
- 07 January 2014: Funds received from 1003857 WIGGINTON RECREATION HALL
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Jaques | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ensor | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Feetenby | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Kathleen M Spence | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Firth | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HASELTINE | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|||||
BEVERLEY MARGARET MCJANNETT | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.30k | £30.08k | £38.17k | £28.02k | £44.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.37k | £19.03k | £20.42k | £23.43k | £24.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.00k | £20.27k | N/A | £15.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO OPERATE AND MANAGE WIGGINTON RECREATION HALL AS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WIGGINTON IN THE CITY OF YORK, WITH THE PRIMARY OBJECTIVE OF PROMOTING (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF CLASS OR GENDER OR RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL TENETS) THE MORAL, INTELLECTUAL, EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE AND IMPROVEMENT, AND THE RATIONAL RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE SAID PARISH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Westfield Grove
Wigginton
York
YO32 2QJ
- Phone:
- 01904769018
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window