HOME-START GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Guildford offers support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children in the local community. We recruit and train volunteers who are usually parents themselves to visit families with at least one child under five, at home, and offer them informal, friendly and confidential support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £88,870 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 November 2013: CIO registration
- 19 January 2016: Funds received from 1054644 HOME-START GUILDFORD
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie McGuire | Chair | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Watkins | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marian Holliday | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Nicholls | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kelly | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brunker | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Roberton | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE FRENCH | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.72k | £142.09k | £138.54k | £160.72k | £302.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.20k | £143.95k | £179.35k | £204.10k | £216.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £48.55k | £43.44k | £54.68k | £50.31k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £5.25k | £88.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONG CHILDREN. 4. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE; WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Start Guildford
Astolat
Coniers Way
GUILDFORD
GU4 7HL
- Phone:
- 01483511181
- Email:
- office@hsguildford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window