SHAR HAMELECH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Orthodox Jewish religion,Orthodox Jewish education and education in general. The relief of poverty, sickness and infirmity for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PINCHOS SHULEM ROTTENBERG | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|||||
NAFTALY BRANDSDORFER | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
YISOCHOR BER ROSENBAUM | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 07/11/2021 | 07/11/2022 | 07/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.09k | £63.72k | £42.48k | £366.86k | £491.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.12k | £61.05k | £44.89k | £372.71k | £493.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 November 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 November 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 November 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 November 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 259 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 April 2022 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 05 April 2022 | 582 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION,ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION AND EDUCATION IN GENERAL.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 2
21 EAST BANK
LONDON
N16 5RG
- Phone:
- 02088029074
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window