BETHLEHEM CARE AND HOSPICE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We presently provide specialist palliative Hospice Care services to those diagnosed with terminal illness in the Occupied Palestinian Territories. The service is presently focused in the Bethlehem Governate where reported cancer cases are highest. Our plans are to extend these services to other towns and villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 01 September 2014: Standard registration
- THE HALLAM (BETHLEHEM) FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Morgan Hopkins | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Doran | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Tucker | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Edward Kelly | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony McDonald | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KEVIN BOOTH | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ann Goodhart | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE SMITH | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev AUGUSTINE CHRISTOPHER O'REILLY | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH GEORGE MCNALLY | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE PHILOMENA MCNALLY | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JOHN SMITH ACIB | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/02/2020 | 18/02/2021 | 18/02/2022 | 18/02/2023 | 18/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.89k | £28.77k | £34.23k | £37.14k | £57.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.41k | £8.57k | £11.29k | £72.35k | £67.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 February 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 February 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/08/2014 as amended on 26 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY SHALL ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN ACCOMMODATION / FACILITIES FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) IN BETHLEHEM OR ANY OTHER PART OF THE DIOCESE OF THE LATIN PATRIARCHATE OF JERUSALEM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT UNDERTAKEN WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS:- 1)THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, AND 3)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: WIDOWHOOD, UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS).
Area of benefit
IN BETHLEHEM OR ANY OTHER PART OF THE DIOCESE OF THE LATIN PATRIARCHATE OF JERUSALEM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALLAM PASTORAL CENTRE
ST. CHARLES STREET
SHEFFIELD
S9 3WU
- Phone:
- 01142364076
- Email:
- trustee@bcandht.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window