TENDER NURSING CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within our area of benefit which is the Boroughs of Chorley and South Ribble and the City of Preston and surrounding areas to provide night nursing, at home, for those who are seriously ill, who without help, may have to be admitted to hospital or hospice. To give relief at night for those caring for the sick To provide the service free.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £111,952 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 October 2013: Standard registration
- 05 April 2016: Funds received from 510572 TENDER NURSING CARE FOR THE SEVERELY SICK
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damian John Bretherton | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ann Bell | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dickinson | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEPH SHERLIKER | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRAHAM CLAYTON | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIS WAREING | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE HAMILTON ALLISTER | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KELLY ANNE BRACEWELL | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.25k | £167.67k | £158.81k | £156.76k | £193.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.09k | £181.28k | £186.27k | £187.62k | £208.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £98.01k | N/A | N/A | £111.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | £85.69k | £16.34k | £96.90k | £80.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN THE BOROUGHS OF CHORLEY AND SOUTH RIBBLE AND THE CITY OF PRESTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROVISION OF NURSING CARE DURING THE NIGHT TO PERSONS WHO ARE SEVERELY SICK AND THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO RELIEVE THOSE WHO ARE CARING FOR OR NURSING FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TENDER NURSING CARE
The Ryan Medical Centre
St. Marys Road
Bamber Bridge
PRESTON
PR5 6JD
- Phone:
- 07897199101
- Email:
- office@tnc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window